Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Reyes, Nora, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Fresno Community Hospital And Medical Center, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Fresno with Brickey, Gabriel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrickey, Gabriel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
Category15 Unlimited - Other Employment |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Fresno |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Nora Reyes against her former employer, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, for various violations. The complaint alleges that the defendant failed to pay all wages, including overtime, in violation of Labor Code ...
Proof of Service
Date: April 12, 2021Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: August 01, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Civil Complaint filed
Date: March 26, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: May 11, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: March 29, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 09, 2022Civil case cover sheet
Date: March 26, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: May 10, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 01, 2023Summons issued and filed
Date: March 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued CRC 3.1385
Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
8-1-23 Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Via Courtcall Attorney B. Bifoss appearing on behalf of attorney A. Paley. |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
3/1/2023 Minute Order Attachment Minute Order Attachment |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert Notice Filed Notice of Assignement of Judge Jeffrey Y. Hamilton |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
06.09.2022 Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case Conditional Settlement Reached Projected Completion Date: 12.31.22 |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
06.09.2022 Notice of CRC 3.1385 Hearing set for 03.01.2023 @ 3:30 p.m. in Dept. 402 Notice of Hearing CRC 3.1385 Hearing 03.01.2023 @ 3:30 p.m., in Dept. 402 |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment and clerk's certificate of mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.