Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
A.D., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Fresno County Department Of Social Services, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Gaab, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaab, Kimberly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff A.D. against Fresno County Department of Social Services (DSS) and other unknown defendants. The complaint alleges negligence and seeks damages. Plaintiff, who was between the ages of three and six at the time, cl...
Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: February 19, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: March 03, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: February 16, 2021Answer Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 29, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Government Exemption Claimed for stip and order to continue trial dates |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
1-4-23 (Proposed) Order on Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Pre-Trial Deadlines Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept. 503 (Proposed) Order on Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Pre-Trial Deadlines |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
03.25.2022 Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation only filed Stipulation and Order filed for Protective Order - Confidential Designation only Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
3/24/2022-Proposed Stipulation and Protective Order-Confidential Designation only Order Received for Signature Forwarded to: 503 Stipulation and Protective Order-Confidential Designation only |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Filed Notice of Change of Address of Counsel for Plaintiff |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation ADR Stipulation Mediation filed Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Steven Vartabedian |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.