Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Enriqueta Lira, Enriqueta Lira, By And Through Her Successors In Interest, Becky Marquez, Mary Lucci, Roberto Lira, And Louis Lira, Lira, Louis, Lira, Roberto, Lucci, Mary, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Brar, Rajvir Kaur, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., A California Nonprofit Corporation, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc., Nogy, Wade, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Brickey, Gabriel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrickey, Gabriel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 29, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Association of Attorney filed
Date: January 04, 2022Notice Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: March 02, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: February 09, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 24, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 29, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 05, 2021Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 09, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: August 13, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 30, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: August 18, 2021Petition filed
Date: May 05, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: May 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment with certificate of mailing |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Status Conference Set Per Order 8/18/21 Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
1/4/22 Association of Attorney/Counsel Association of Attorney filed Notice of Association; hereby associates Davis Miles McGuire Gardner and attorneys Steven Weinberger and Michael E. Medina, Jr. |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Compel Arbitration Filed 5/5/21 ~ Yvonne Pierrou Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
211021 Disassociation of counsel Notice Filed Notice of Disassociation of Counsel |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order filed Stipulation Submitting Claim To Binding Arbitration: Order Staying Court Action Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 501 Order: Staying Court Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.