Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Farese Joseph An Individual, Lewis Alexa An Individual, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Aivazi Zhana, Avanessian Arpa, against Coeler Peter Dba Pac Properties, represented by Lee Ted M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseBurbank |
Complaint
Date: May 21, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 21, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 21, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 21, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 21, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 11, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: August 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 28, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: October 06, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: October 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: December 13, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES)
Date: October 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00in Department B
Date: October 22, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: May 21, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.