Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mendoza, Delbert Vincent, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by In Pro Per, against Delima, Anthony David, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Harassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE BY MAIL CH-120 SERVED ON DELBERT AND KRISTINE MENDOZA ON 04/09/2021 IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of ANTHONY DAVID DELIMA (DEFENDANT) | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of ANTHONY DAVID DELIMA (DEFENDANT) | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES A JONES-WILLIAMS: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) Date: 04/02/2021 Time: 11:00 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: TRO DENIED - CONT FOR FURTHER HEARING - Matter is continued to May 24, 2021 at 1:30pm in dept 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: CONTESTED HEARING ON OSC FOR TRO (HARASSMENT) Date: 05/24/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE TO ANTHONY DELIMA OF ATTACHMENTS, NOTICE OF COURT HEARING (CIVIL HARASSMENT), REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS, RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS- BLANK, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS NOT ISSUED ON 03/24/2021. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of DELBERT VINCENT MENDOZA (PLAINTIFF) |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER *** NOT GRANTED*** | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT HEARING | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) Date: 04/02/2021 Time: 11:00 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: TRO DENIED - CONT FOR FURTHER HEARING
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING CIVIL HARASSMENT |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) Date: 04/02/2021 Time: 11:00 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.