Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Aronovsky, Steve, filed a(n) Toxic,Environmental - Torts case against Bayview Environmental Services, Inc., City Of Pacifica, A California Municipality, City Ofpacifica, A California Municipality, Devcon Construction Company, Inc, Does 1-100, Inclusive, (total of 6) See All represented by Emblidge, G Scott, Kenyon, Michelle Marchetta, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2021 |
Category(30) Complex Unlimited Environmental/Toxic Tort |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeToxic,Environmental |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: November 15, 20212022 01 20 FINAL Deft SI CMS (6031)
Date: January 20, 202252501CaseM008bea
Date: January 25, 202221_CIV_06031_City_of_Pac_ent_Statement_2_1_22
Date: January 21, 2022Motion
Date: December 14, 2021Complaint
Date: November 08, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: November 15, 2021AronovskyCaseMangement_Statement
Date: October 27, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: November 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | AronovskyCaseMangement_Statement | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | 52501CaseM008bea | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 21_CIV_06031_City_of_Pac_ent_Statement_2_1_22 | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022 01 20 FINAL Deft SI CMS (6031) | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
January 09, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: HONORABLE MARIE S. WEINER, Department 2 STEVE ARONOVSKY VS. IGNATIAN CORPORATION/ST. IGNATIUS COLLEGE PREP, ET AL. STEVE ARONOVSKY PRO SE IGNATIAN CORPORATION/ST. IGNATIUS COLLEGE PREP MOTION F...
Judge: HONORABLE MARIE S. WEINER |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order FOR TRO AND INJUNCTION FOR DEMOLITION OF PROPERTY LOCATED AT 290 EDGEWOOD DR., PACIFICA, CA, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ETC... Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR TRO AND INJUNCTION FOR DEMOLITION OF PROPERTY LOCATED AT 290 EDGEWOOD DR., PACIFICA, CA, Motion FOR TRO AND INJUNCTION FOR DEMOLITION OF PROPERTY LOCATED AT 290 EDGEWOOD DR., PACIFICA, CA, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ETC... |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TRO AND INJUNCTION FOR DEMOLITION OF PRO Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TRO AND INJUNCTION FOR DEMOLITION OF PROPERTY LOCATED AT 290 EDGEWOOD DR., PACIFICA, CA, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ETC... served on SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support OF STEVE ARONOVSKY TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND INJUNCTION FOR DEMOLITI Declaration in Support OF STEVE ARONOVSKY TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND INJUNCTION FOR DEMOLITION OF PROPERTY LOCATED AT 290 EDGEWOOD DR., PACIFICA, CA, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ETC... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.