Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Siliato, Jordan, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Gramercy On The Park Homeowners' Association, Labor Commissioner Department Labor Standards Enforcement, represented by Kawar, Ramsey F., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
Category(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Jordan Siliato against Gramercy on the Park Homeowners' Association and the Labor Commissioner/Department Labor Standards Enforcement (DLSE) in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Mateo. The plainti...
Complaint
Date: August 17, 20213 MPA
Date: January 20, 20224 Dec R. Kawar Demurrer
Date: January 20, 20222 Demurrer
Date: January 20, 20221 Notice
Date: January 20, 20225 RJN with Exhibits
Date: January 20, 20226 POS demurrer
Date: January 20, 2022Non-Opp in Lieu of Reply
Date: April 07, 2022Proposed Order 04192022
Date: April 20, 2022Gramercy CMC Stmt 5-4-22 FINAL
Date: May 04, 20221 Notice ISO Demurrer to FAC
Date: May 12, 20224 Dec R. Kawar ISO Demurrer FAC
Date: May 12, 20226 POS demurrer FAC
Date: May 12, 20225 RJN ISO Demurrer to FAC
Date: May 12, 20223 MPA ISO Demurrer to FAC
Date: May 12, 20222 Demurrer to FAC
Date: May 12, 2022Reply ISO Demurrer
Date: August 11, 2022Notice
Date: August 26, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: October 14, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: October 14, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: October 14, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: October 14, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 30, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of
Date: November 04, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 17, 2021Notice
Date: January 20, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: December 03, 2021CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: December 02, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 20, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 01, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 02, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: April 13, 2022Hearing on Demurrer
Date: April 15, 2022Notice
Date: April 12, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: April 13, 2022Order
Date: April 27, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 04, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 12, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 12, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 11, 2022Amended Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: August 15, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: October 20, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 20, 2022Notice
Date: August 26, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: January 20, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of
Date: November 04, 2021Notice
Date: August 10, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 12, 2022First Amended Complaint
Date: April 12, 2022Non-Opposition to
Date: April 07, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 03, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 19, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 20, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: October 20, 2021Demurrer to Amended Complaint
Date: May 12, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE
Date: May 09, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 04, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: December 09, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 03, 2021Amended POS
Date: August 15, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: January 20, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: August 15, 2022Notice
Date: May 12, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 03, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: May 12, 2022Demurrer to
Date: January 20, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: October 14, 2021CMC Stmt 08302022 Final
Date: August 30, 2022Answer to FAC
Date: September 27, 2022Gramercy CMC Stmt 10182022
Date: October 19, 2022Gramercy CMC Stmt Final-scanned
Date: January 20, 20232023.01.23.Full CMC Stmt v1
Date: January 24, 2023doc04066820230404181838
Date: April 05, 2023Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | doc04066820230404181838 | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.01.23.Full CMC Stmt v1 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Gramercy CMC Stmt Final-scanned | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Gramercy CMC Stmt 10182022 | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to FAC | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CMC Stmt 08302022 Final | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Demurrer TO VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Proof of Service by MAIL of DEFENDANT GRAMERCY ON THE PARK HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION'S REPLY B Amended Proof of Service by MAIL of DEFENDANT GRAMERCY ON THE PARK HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT served on SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.