Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Floyd Johnson, As A Representative And Aggrieved Employer Pursuant To The Private Attorneys General Act, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Dion-Kindem, Peter R, against Does 1 Through 10, Field Nation, Llc, Gerke, Darren, Hardel, Carl, Khan, Mynul, (total of 6) See All represented by Weissman, William Hays, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
Category(15) Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Plaintiff Floyd Johnson against Field Nation, LLC and other defendants. The complaint alleges violations of the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA) and misclassification of employees as independent contrac...
2024_04_15_Johnson_Notic_ry_of_Judgment_Clean
Date: April 15, 20242024_04_10_Johnson_Stip_ation_Award_with_Exh
Date: April 10, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 12, 2021Complaint
Date: August 12, 20212022-02-04 - Johnson - Stip and PO re Belaire West Notice - final
Date: February 04, 20222022-06-30 - Johnson - Statement of Nonagreement - Signed
Date: June 30, 20222022.07.22 Notice of Motion
Date: July 22, 20222022.07.22 Proof of Service (mtc arb)
Date: July 22, 20222022.07.22 Defendants' MPA
Date: July 22, 20222022.07.22 Declaration
Date: July 22, 20222022.07.22 [Proposed] Order
Date: July 22, 20222022_10_07_Johnson_OMPA_TC_Arbitration_final
Date: October 07, 2022POS Re Reply ISO MTCA
Date: October 14, 2022Field Nation- Def's REPLY iso MTC Arb
Date: October 14, 2022Jason Woods Decl. iso MTC arbitration (Reply)
Date: October 14, 202265651DECLA01a16f
Date: October 28, 202265651DEFEN00ed8b
Date: October 28, 202265651Proof02d320
Date: October 28, 2022Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: February 28, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: July 22, 2022Statement of Non-Agreement
Date: June 30, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 22, 2022Notice of Hearing re
Date: October 21, 2022Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: December 27, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: July 22, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: July 22, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 22, 2022First Amended Complaint
Date: October 18, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 12, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: August 12, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: October 26, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 29, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of
Date: December 06, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 24, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 14, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 07, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: October 14, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: October 21, 2022Notice
Date: December 06, 2021CMC - At issue - Referred to ADR Stip already filed
Date: February 28, 202210 Day Reminder Notice to Complete the ADR Process
Date: September 15, 2022Request for Entry of Default Not Entered
Date: November 30, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: February 14, 2022CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: November 30, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 30, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: October 14, 2022Amended Summons Issued / Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 29, 20212023_08_23_Johnson_Super_of_Change_of_Address
Date: August 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024_04_15_Johnson_Notic_ry_of_Judgment_Clean | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024_04_10_Johnson_Stip_ation_Award_with_Exh | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023_08_23_Johnson_Super_of_Change_of_Address | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF FLOYD JOHNSON'S INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS AND DISMISS ALL NON-INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS BY DEFENDANTS FIELD NATION, LLC AND MYNUL KHAN
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 65651DECLA01a16f | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 65651DEFEN00ed8b | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 65651Proof02d320 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing re MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF FLOYD JOHNSON'S INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIM Notice of Hearing re MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF FLOYD JOHNSON'S INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS AND DISMISS ALL NON-INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS BY DEFENDANTS FIELD NATION, LLC AND MYNUL KHAN on 12/02/22 at 9:00 am |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 10/21/2022 Motion to Compel ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF FLOYD JOHNSON'S INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS AND DISMISS ALL NON-INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.