Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Sun, Xianfeng, filed a(n) (16) Unlimited Fraud case represented by Artiga-Purcell, Camilo, against Choate, Kenneth, Does 1 - 75, Inclusive, Does 4 - 75, Inclusive, Eka Consulting Llc, An Ohio Limited Liability Company With Its Principal Executive Office In Franklin County, Ohio, Klender, Rebecca, (total of 15) See All represented by Buckley, Thomas A, Delcin, Catherine, Esq, Neustadt, Jeffrey B., Onu, Mitch O., Ryan, Bing Zhang, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Swope, V presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
Category(16) Unlimited Fraud |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Eka Consulting Llc, An Ohio Limited Liability Company With Its Principal Executive Office In Franklin County, Ohio
Lovevite Llc, A California Limited Liability Company With Its Principal Executive Office In San Mateo County, California
Case Management Statement
Date: November 12, 2021Request to Enter Default
Date: October 19, 2021Complaint
Date: July 26, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 10, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 10, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: November 01, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: October 19, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 29, 2021Objections to Evidence
Date: November 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 09, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 19, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Hearing re
Date: August 30, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: October 19, 2021Hearing on Demurrer
Date: December 06, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: July 26, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: July 26, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: November 19, 2021Demurrer to Complaint
Date: August 30, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: August 30, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of
Date: December 20, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: August 30, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 30, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: August 30, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: December 15, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: November 12, 2021Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: October 14, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 26, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: September 15, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: October 01, 2021Xianfeng Sun CMC Statement
Date: March 30, 2024Sun POS 032924 AF
Date: March 29, 2024Sun CMTSC Statement 032824 AF
Date: March 29, 2024signed(dated)-adr-cv-11
Date: February 01, 2024signed-adr-cv-11
Date: January 31, 2024Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 01, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 25, 2022Amendment to Complaint
Date: June 22, 2022Motion to Vacate
Date: August 22, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate
Date: April 12, 2022Change of Address
Date: April 14, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: May 06, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 25, 2022Proposed Judgment Received
Date: March 03, 2022Request For
Date: March 02, 2022Request for Entry of Default Not Entered
Date: January 04, 2022Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: September 01, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: May 06, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: July 20, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 29, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 02, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: March 02, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: July 25, 2022Hearing on Demurrer
Date: December 05, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 01, 2022Request to Enter Default
Date: January 05, 2022Motion to Quash
Date: February 06, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 06, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash
Date: July 25, 2022Evidence
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 06, 2022Declaration
Date: March 02, 2022Notice of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: May 17, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 02, 2022Summary
Date: March 02, 2022Hearing on Demurrer
Date: March 21, 2022Non-Opposition to
Date: April 14, 2022Amended Notice Of
Date: December 14, 2022Stipulation & Order
Date: May 25, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 06, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: July 20, 2022Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: August 11, 2022Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: April 28, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: March 02, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: March 02, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 05, 2022Demurrer to Complaint
Date: December 12, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 14, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: September 01, 2022Application
Date: March 02, 2022Demurrer to
Date: May 31, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: July 25, 2022Order
Date: May 06, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: March 02, 2022Sun ADR Stip 2 PS
Date: January 15, 2024Separate Statement
Date: September 01, 202256132DEFEN009152
Date: April 13, 202256258CaseM015ad2
Date: April 15, 202256258NONOP00bf5a
Date: April 15, 202256258Notic0279d1
Date: April 15, 2022Sun Change of Address
Date: April 28, 20222022-4-29 CMS
Date: April 29, 202257763Notic004e81
Date: May 17, 2022Executed Stip Re Set Aside
Date: May 20, 2022Amended Complaint Naming Does 1-3
Date: June 22, 202256067Notic00b476
Date: April 12, 2022Mager POS
Date: July 20, 2022Choate POS
Date: July 20, 2022MAGER-Mager.Decl.MTQ
Date: July 25, 2022MAGER-C.Decl.MTQ
Date: July 25, 2022MAGER-POS.MTQ
Date: July 25, 2022MAGER-MPAs.MTQ
Date: July 25, 2022MAGER-NTC.MTQ
Date: July 25, 2022Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion
Date: May 03, 2023Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues
Date: March 13, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: March 13, 2023Order
Date: June 20, 2023PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: May 31, 2023Order
Date: March 13, 2023Declaration in Opposition
Date: February 27, 2023Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: March 10, 2023Objections to Evidence
Date: March 08, 2023Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 03, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: March 06, 2023Declaration in Opposition
Date: February 27, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: March 06, 2023PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: February 28, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 27, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 06, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: March 06, 202361842Subst0021c8
Date: August 11, 202262120CaseM0050a2
Date: August 17, 2022Order
Date: September 26, 2023Order
Date: August 04, 2023PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: July 17, 2023Hearing on Demurrer
Date: July 03, 2023Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues
Date: May 17, 2023Declaration in Opposition
Date: May 03, 20232022-8-30 CMS_File_Copy
Date: August 31, 2022MPA iso Mtn for Summary Adjudication
Date: September 01, 2022Ntc of Mtn for Summary Adjudication
Date: September 01, 2022Separate Statement iso MSA
Date: September 01, 2022Proposed Order
Date: September 01, 2022Appendix of Exhibits iso MSA
Date: September 01, 2022Proof of Service
Date: September 01, 2022Answer
Date: October 18, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: August 03, 2023MPA IOT Turkson Demurrer_
Date: November 17, 202267672Demur002604
Date: December 12, 202267672Decla017502
Date: December 12, 202267826Amend0065ed
Date: December 14, 202267816Amend008d1f
Date: December 14, 2022Opp to MSJ_A Turkson_Final
Date: February 03, 202371579Reque036aea
Date: February 28, 2023Proposed.Order-MAGER
Date: February 28, 202371579MEMOR04bf8f
Date: February 28, 202371579Separ009338
Date: February 28, 202371579Decla01bf32
Date: February 28, 202371579Decla02ac98
Date: February 28, 2023Proposed.Order-CS-MAGER
Date: February 28, 2023Supp Sun Decl
Date: March 06, 2023Reply Separate Statement
Date: March 06, 2023Reply MPA iso MSA
Date: March 06, 2023RJN ISO MSA
Date: March 06, 2023Proof of Service
Date: March 06, 202372087EVIDE00bc5c
Date: March 08, 2023Aaron_Declaration 1
Date: March 10, 2023Sun MSJ OPP Dec SAF 050323
Date: May 04, 2023Sun MSJ D SS AF 050323
Date: May 04, 2023Sun POS 050323 AF
Date: May 04, 2023Proposed Order Cover Sheet_1
Date: May 31, 2023Proposed Order
Date: May 31, 20232023-7-14 Proposed Order
Date: July 15, 20232023-7-15_Proposed_Order_Cover_Sheet_FV
Date: July 15, 2023Sun CMC 072423 AF
Date: July 25, 2023Sun POS 072423 AF
Date: July 25, 20232023-7-26 CMS_File Copy
Date: July 27, 2023Sun GD AF 101123
Date: October 19, 2023Sun EPOS 101123 AFr
Date: October 19, 202321-CIV-04018 Request for Dismissal 20231031
Date: October 31, 202321-CIV-04018 CMS 20231113
Date: November 02, 202379817CaseM00a74a
Date: July 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
March 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Xianfeng Sun CMC Statement | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Sun POS 032924 AF | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Sun CMTSC Statement 032824 AF | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | signed(dated)-adr-cv-11 | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | signed-adr-cv-11 | |
January 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Sun ADR Stip 2 PS | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CMC - At issue - Referral to ADR | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ADR Referral | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 11/13/2023 Case Management Conference Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.