Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Winterspring Smith, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fitzgerald, John L., against Does 1-250, Inclusive, Hopkins-Smith Tappan, As Trustee, Heather, Tappan, Heather Hopkins-Smith, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Management Statement
Date: October 01, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Winterspring--CMC Statement (02152022)
Date: February 08, 2022Winterspring--Judgment--Executed
Date: March 18, 2022First Amended Complaint
Date: July 09, 2021Complaint
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Winterspring--Judgment--Executed | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Winterspring--CMC Statement (02152022) | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/15/2022 at 10:00 a.m. Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/15/2022 at 10:00 a.m. |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CMC - Not at issue - other/motion pending. Defaults entered against both Defendants as requested on 8/25/2021 |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Summons Issued / Filed FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.