Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Magdalena Larsson, Anna Kerstin, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Pj Assignment) case in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Davis, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Pj Assignment) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a petition for a change of name filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo. The petitioner, Anna Kerstin Magdalena Larsson, is seeking to change her name to Magdalena Anna Larsson. The petition requests the court...
Petition for Name Change
Date: April 06, 2021Order to Show Cause Change of Name
Date: April 09, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name
Date: May 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 05/20/2021 Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name Signed By: JUDGE DAVISDate Signed: 5/20/2021New Name: MAGDALENA ANNA LARSSON Decree Changing Name Signed By: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 5/20/2021 New Name: MAGDALENA ANNA LARSSON |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Publication re: Name Change | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Change of Name Signed by Judge Davis, III on 4/8/21 Order to Show Cause Change of Name Signed by Judge Davis, III on 4/8/21 |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Name Hearing | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer DEPARTMENT 1 Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Name Change | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Received OSC NAME CHANGE Proposed Order Received OSC NAME CHANGE |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Decree Received | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.