Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Escalante, Moises, Facebook, Inc. A Delaware Corporation, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Swanson, Benjamin D., against Does 1 To 30 Inclusive, Facebook, Inc., Fu, Fabian, Loop Transportation, Inc., represented by Hughes, Bradford G, Sarabekian, Seta, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Moises Escalante against defendants Fabian Fu, Loop Transportation, Inc., Facebook, Inc., and Does 1 to 30. The complaint alleges negligence and general negligence...
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 22, 2021Complaint
Date: March 22, 2021Facebook CMCS 012722
Date: January 12, 202251947CaseM006f60
Date: January 13, 20222022_01_12_P_CMC_Statement
Date: January 13, 202252465Notic0017aa
Date: January 25, 20222022_04_12_Plaintiff_s_C_Statement_04_27_22_
Date: April 12, 202256154CaseM00efd8
Date: April 13, 202259091STIPU00fbef
Date: June 15, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: August 05, 2021CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: July 07, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 05, 2021Cross Complaint
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 13, 2022Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: March 30, 2022CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: January 14, 2022CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: February 25, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: October 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 12, 2022Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: October 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 12, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: April 27, 202210 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: May 25, 2022Change of Address
Date: January 24, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: September 20, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 20, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 22, 2021ADR Referral
Date: April 27, 2022Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: June 17, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 13, 202255532Subst005041
Date: March 30, 202264884Reque006600
Date: October 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | 64884Reque006600 | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR COPY MAILED TO DEFENDANT ATTORNEY SETA SARABEKIAN AND PLAINTIFF ATTORNE Stipulation and Order to ADR COPY MAILED TO DEFENDANT ATTORNEY SETA SARABEKIAN AND PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY ETHAN NIEDERMEYER ON 6/17/2022 BY UNA Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 59091STIPU00fbef | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR Stipulation Follow Up 10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/27/2022 Case Management Conference Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Referral | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Counsel Ethan Niedermeyer for Plaintiff. |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CMC - At issue - Referral to ADR | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | 56154CaseM00efd8 | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference 4/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of Case Management Conference 4/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.