Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kumar, Rajesh, Kumar, Shobha, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case against Baila Floors, A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: January 29, 2021Petition
Date: January 29, 2021Amended Judgment
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: May 04, 2021Judgment
Date: April 30, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 04, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: May 14, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: February 04, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: February 04, 2021Petition to Release Mechanic's Lien
Date: April 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Judgment AMENDED JUDGMENT DECREEING PROPERTY RELEASED FROM MECHANIC'S LIEN AMENDED JUDGMENT DECREEING PROPERTY RELEASED FROM MECHANIC'S LIEN |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing AMENDED JUDGMENT DECREEING PROPERTY RELEASED FROM MECHANIC'S LIEN Affidavit of Mailing AMENDED JUDGMENT DECREEING PROPERTY RELEASED FROM MECHANIC'S LIEN |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment JUDGMENT DECREEING PROPERTY RELEASED FROM MECHANIC'S LIEN JUDGMENT DECREEING PROPERTY RELEASED FROM MECHANIC'S LIEN |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORDER ON PETITION TO RELEASE MECHANIC'S LIEN Order After Hearing ORDER ON PETITION TO RELEASE MECHANIC'S LIEN |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Petition to Release Mechanic's Lien 04/21/2021 Petition to Release Mechanic's Lien Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | No appearance by any parties or their counsel of record. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.