Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
In Pro Per filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Renee C. Day presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryProbate - Guardianships |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2099 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL FILE FOLDER | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES A JONES-WILLIAMS: Event: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN Date: 10/07/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: DAY, RENEE Location: DEPT 2 Result: GRANTED
Judge: DAY, RENEE |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL. NOTICE OF GUARDIANSHIP COURT INVESTIGATION. | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PROBATE GUARDIANSHIP ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OF MINOR IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of DONNA S KERSH (APPLICANT) | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | COPIES IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of DONNA S KERSH (APPLICANT) | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP OR CONSERVATORSHIP IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of DONNA S KERSH (APPLICANT) | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | 2 CERTIFIED COPIES IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of DONNA S KERSH (APPLICANT) | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CLETS REPORT RECEIVED FROM SHERIFF AND FILED | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVER GRANTED-ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of DONNA S KERSH (APPLICANT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.