Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
In Pro Per filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryProbate - Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2099 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL FILE FOLDER | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PROBATE EXECUTOR ORDER AUTHORIZING INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATE WITH FULL AUTHORITY IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of CARLENE RAE PIMENTAL (APPLICANT) | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of CARLENE RAE PIMENTAL (APPLICANT) | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED: AMENDED PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of CARLENE RAE PIMENTAL (APPLICANT) |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION JUANITA MAE OWENS (DECEDENT); | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 1:30 pm has been rescheduled as follows: Event: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION Date: 09/24/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: GRANTED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE CARLENE RAE PIMENTAL (APPLICANT); | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL - FINAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL, FINAL. CARLENE RAE PIMENTAL (APPLICANT); |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVER GRANTED-ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) CARLENE RAE PIMENTAL (APPLICANT); | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (PROBATE) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.