Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Cahill, Richard S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cahill, Christyne L, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/Minor Child |
Last RefreshedJune 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | No appearances necessary. The First Amended Petition for Dissolution was filed 8/21/2021. A Proof of Service of the Amended Summons and Petition is filed with the court. More than 30 days have passed ... | |
May 03, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | No appearances necessary. The First Amended Petition for Dissolution was filed 8/21/2021. A Proof of Service of the Amended Summons and Petition is filed with the court. More than 30 days have passed ... | |
March 01, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | The parties, or counsel if represented, are ordered to appear personally or remotely by Zoom to discuss the status of the case. Parties wishing to appear by Zoom are required to complete and submit a ... | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF MEDIATOR Event: FCS MEDIATION Date: 10/04/2021 Time: 8:00 am Judge: FCS, CALENDAR Location: FAMILY COURT SERVICES CALENDAR Result: MEDIATION SUCCESSFUL
Judge: FCS, CALENDAR |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO CHRYSTYNE L CAHILL OF FAMILY LAW MARRIAGE DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP PETITION MARRIAGE DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP FL100, SUMMONS FL110, AND BLANK RESPONSE MARRIAGE DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP FORM FL 120 **AMENDED**, COMPLETED AND BLANK DECLARATION UNDER UNIFOM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT FORM FL105, REQUEST FOR ORDER FOR FL300, AND BLANK RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER FORM FL320; FL305 ON 09/12/21 IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of RICHARD S CAHILL (PETITIONER) | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
FCS ORIENTATION SCHEDULED Event: FCS ORIENTATION Date: 10/04/2021 Time: 8:00 am Judge: FCS, CALENDAR Location: FAMILY COURT SERVICES CALENDAR Result: ORIENTATION-RESPONDENT PRESENT
Judge: FCS, CALENDAR |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: PETITIONER'S OSC/MTN FOR CHILD CUSTODY, VISIT Date: 10/04/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: STIPULATION
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVER GRANTED-ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of RICHARD S CAHILL (PETITIONER) | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY EMERGENCY (EX PARTE ORDERS)--TEMP ORDERS NOT GRANTED IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of RICHARD S CAHILL (PETITIONER) | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (FEE WAIVER) IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of RICHARD S CAHILL (PETITIONER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.