Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barber, Loraine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barber, Jr, David Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryFamily - Dissolution |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 8/26/2021 IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of LORAINE BARBER (PETITIONER) | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FINAL MARITAL STATUS ENDS 11/18/2021 IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of LORAINE BARBER (PETITIONER) | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of LORAINE BARBER (PETITIONER) | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE PETITIONER'S PRELIMINARY AND FINAL IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of LORAINE BARBER (PETITIONER) | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of LORAINE BARBER (PETITIONER) |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND PETITION-FAMILY LAW, FL-100 PETITION-MARRIAGE/DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP (FAMILY LAW), FL-311 CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION APPLICATION ATTACHMENT, FL-110 SUMMONS (FAMILY LAW), FL-105 DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORMCHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT, FL-120 RESPONSE-MARRIAGE/DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN FAMILY LAW CASEMANAGEMENT PROGRAM AND HEARING AS TO DAVID WAYNE BARBER JR ON 06/17/2021 IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of LORAINE BARBER (PETITIONER) | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PERSONAL SERVICE TO DAVID WAYNE BARBER JR OF SUMMONS AND PETITION FAMILY LAW, FL 100 PETITION MARRIAGE/DOMESTIV PARTNERSHIP FAMILY LAW, FL 311 CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION APPLICATION ATTACHMENT, FL 110 SUMMOSN FAMILY LAW, FL 105 DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISICTION AND ENFORCEMENT, FL 120 RESPONSE MARRIAGE/ DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, MOTICE OF INCLUSION IN FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT PROGRAM AND HEARING ON 05/17/2021. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of LORAINE BARBER (PETITIONER) | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGMENT PROGRAM AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT PROGRAM AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW INTAKE FORM - RECEIVED AND DESTROYED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.