Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
C R Custom Carpentry, Inc, Frakes, Brittany, Frakes, David, Hills Construction, Inc, Nrt West, Inc. A California Corporation, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Marks, E. David, against Does 1 Through 40, Inclusive, Duro Concrete, Inc.A California Corporation, Frakes, Brittany, Frakes, David, Hills Construction, Inc. A California Corporation, (total of 11) See All represented by Crespo, Daniel A, De Hope, Joseph J, Jr, Fitzgerald, John L., Jacobs, Paul N, Luther, Robert S, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Finigan, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFinigan, Jeffrey R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Case Management Statement
Date: June 09, 2022Amendment to Complaint
Date: September 03, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 02, 2021Order
Date: December 16, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: May 17, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 17, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: April 20, 2021Cross Complaint
Date: May 17, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 16, 2023Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: October 11, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: September 01, 2023Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: August 31, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: August 31, 2023Order
Date: August 21, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: August 24, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: August 28, 2023Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement CCP 877.6
Date: August 24, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: July 17, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: July 13, 2023Order
Date: June 26, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 26, 2023Motion for Good Faith Settlement
Date: June 23, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: May 15, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: April 28, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: April 28, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: April 28, 2023Trial Order
Date: April 27, 2023Order
Date: December 13, 2022Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: December 28, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: December 12, 2022Notice of Entry of Order
Date: December 28, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 23, 2022Hearing on Demurrer
Date: November 18, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 20, 2022Answer
Date: July 13, 2021Amendment to Complaint
Date: April 28, 2022Cross Complaint
Date: June 25, 2021Answer
Date: June 25, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: August 16, 2022Demand For Jury Trial
Date: December 08, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: December 08, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 12, 2022Demurrer to Cross-Complaint
Date: September 29, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 16, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 30, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 10, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: April 18, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: August 23, 2022Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: August 03, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 16, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 15, 2022Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: June 29, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: April 19, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 30, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 02, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 19, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 18, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 15, 2022Answer
Date: April 12, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 07, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 05, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: November 30, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 04, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 03, 2022First Amended Complaint
Date: April 04, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 04, 2022Stipulation & Order
Date: March 29, 2022Amendment to Complaint
Date: March 01, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: April 04, 2022Amended Summons Issued / Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: February 03, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 04, 2022Attorney's Certificate of Merit
Date: April 04, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 16, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 16, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 07, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 01, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 27, 2022Complaint in Intervention
Date: January 03, 2022Objection
Date: December 08, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: December 08, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 07, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 15, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 14, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: December 08, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 29, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 01, 2021Cross Complaint
Date: December 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 29, 2021Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: December 08, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: December 08, 2021Complaint in Intervention
Date: November 18, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 17, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: October 28, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 05, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 17, 2021Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 03, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 04, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 18, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 21, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: August 18, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 15, 2021Answer
Date: July 02, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: August 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 26, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 05, 2021Cross Complaint
Date: July 02, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: July 02, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: August 05, 2021Answer
Date: July 13, 2021Answer
Date: July 07, 2021Answer
Date: July 07, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 02, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: June 28, 2021Answer
Date: July 02, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: June 28, 2021Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: June 25, 2021Cross Complaint
Date: June 16, 2021Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: June 16, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 25, 2021Answer
Date: June 25, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 16, 2021Answer
Date: June 16, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 17, 2021Complaint
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 20, 2021Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: May 17, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: May 11, 2021RFD Hills XC (Final) (01042665xDE505)
Date: April 23, 202496562Proof01b902
Date: April 23, 202496562Reque002c0d
Date: April 23, 202495875Notic0075c1
Date: April 12, 20242024-04-10 POS re Dismissal
Date: April 10, 20242024-04-05 Rqst for Dis_FILE
Date: April 10, 202494475Reque00e1d8
Date: March 22, 20242024-03-08 MASTER Stip for GSF_FINAL
Date: March 11, 20242024-02-23 Ntc of Stlmt_FILE
Date: February 23, 202491136Notic007432
Date: February 01, 202490905Order0011a5
Date: January 29, 202490651Notic009548
Date: January 24, 2024Answer to Cross Complaint
Date: January 07, 202252667CaseM0037f5
Date: January 28, 2022CMS (00683075xDE505)
Date: February 01, 20222022-02-03 CMC_FILE
Date: February 03, 20222022-02-03 POS re CMC
Date: February 03, 2022Ponzini Insulation's CMS for 2.16.2022 CMC
Date: February 03, 2022CMS - NRT 02-07-22
Date: February 07, 20222022-03-14 AMD Summons
Date: March 16, 20222022-03-16 POS
Date: March 16, 20222022-03-15 Certificate
Date: March 16, 20222022-03-16 Stip and PO re Amd Complaint_R
Date: March 16, 20222022-02-16 (PGI) Answer Hill X-C
Date: March 23, 20222022-04-04 Ntc of Entry of Order
Date: April 04, 2022Hills CMCS 4.18.22 (00709178xDE505)
Date: April 04, 20222022-04-04 AMD Cmplt_R
Date: April 04, 20222022-04-04 POS
Date: April 04, 20222022-03-15 Certificate
Date: April 04, 20222022-03-14 AMD Summons
Date: April 04, 20222022-04-04 CMC_Kashefizadeh
Date: April 04, 20222022-04-04 POS re CMC
Date: April 04, 2022Ponzini Insulation Inc. - CMS
Date: April 05, 202255806CaseM00fbfe
Date: April 06, 202255906CaseM00c997
Date: April 07, 2022NRT Ans to FAC
Date: April 12, 20222022-04-18 POS re Summons_Peter Sung
Date: April 20, 202256453ANSWE00e23a
Date: April 20, 20222022-04-18 POS re Summons_Sung Eng
Date: April 20, 2022Roe Amendment No. 3 (00718140xDE505)
Date: April 28, 20222022-06-09 CMS
Date: June 09, 20222022-06-15 (PGI) CMC Stmt
Date: June 15, 2022hILLS (00736754xDE505)
Date: June 16, 2022Ponzini Insulation's CMS for 6.30.2022 CMC
Date: June 20, 20222022-06-29 (PGI) Ntc Posting Jury Fees
Date: June 29, 2022Answer to Cross Complaint
Date: July 15, 202289219Decla0395f3
Date: January 02, 202489219Decla0257bf
Date: January 02, 202489219Decla01a855
Date: January 02, 202489219Propo053d1f
Date: January 02, 202489219Reque049655
Date: January 02, 202489219DEFEN00ae58
Date: January 02, 202489166PROPO00c565
Date: December 29, 202388818Propo05a804
Date: December 21, 202388818SungS00e9b2
Date: December 21, 202388818Reque048ee5
Date: December 21, 202388818Decla02367e
Date: December 21, 202388818Decla03a72a
Date: December 21, 202388818Decla01231e
Date: December 21, 2023ANSWER_SUNG
Date: August 02, 202261362Notic00a7bb
Date: August 03, 20222022-08-10 CMC_Pltfs_FILE
Date: August 10, 2022Hills CMCS 8.31.22 (Final) (00760986xDE505)
Date: August 16, 2022Dismissal - Valencia (F) (00760988xDE505)
Date: August 16, 2022CMC_STM_PETER_SUNG_8_31_22_
Date: August 19, 2022POS (00719848xDE505)
Date: August 23, 2022Default (00764068xDE505)
Date: August 23, 2022Ntc of Change of Firm Name 09-07-22
Date: September 07, 2022Pos (00764911xDE505)
Date: September 12, 2022Default (00771361xDE505)
Date: September 12, 2022CMS - NRT 09-21-22
Date: September 21, 20222022-09-21 POS re CMS
Date: September 21, 20222022-09-21 CMS_Pltfs_FILE
Date: September 21, 202263869CaseM00f530
Date: September 23, 202263869CaseM0059d2
Date: September 23, 20222022-09-26 (PGI) CMC Stmt
Date: September 26, 2022cms (00777898xDE505)
Date: September 27, 2022DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2022[PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEMURRER
Date: September 30, 2022LA316963.4298129.CFC Case Management Statement (10.12.22)
Date: September 30, 2022Dismissal CA Flooring (F) (00783211xDE505)
Date: October 05, 2022CMS for October file copy
Date: October 11, 2022Ponzini Insulation's CMS for 10.12.2022 CMC
Date: October 11, 2022Opposition to Demurrer (00793864xDE505)
Date: November 04, 202266127Stipu006a2f
Date: November 08, 2022LA330876-reply
Date: November 11, 2022CMC - NRT 12-12-22
Date: November 22, 20222022-11-22 (PGI) CMC Stmt
Date: November 22, 20222022-11-22 CMS_FILE
Date: November 22, 2022CFC CMC Statement (12.12.22)
Date: November 23, 2022JVAL CMS DEC 2022
Date: November 23, 2022668691212200ffeb
Date: November 23, 202266880CaseM00b997
Date: November 23, 202266894HRG12005ebc
Date: November 24, 2022LA335202.4488264.CFC Answer to Hills Cross-Complaint
Date: November 24, 202266944NOTIC00f425
Date: November 28, 2022CMS (00804346xDE505)
Date: November 30, 202280269Joint00e249
Date: August 08, 2023CMS 8-8-23
Date: August 09, 202380409CaseM00cd1b
Date: August 09, 2023LA428005 PO
Date: August 11, 202380651CaseM007e2e
Date: August 14, 2023cmc (00922049xDE505)
Date: August 14, 2023Notice (00922060xDE505)
Date: August 14, 202380667Proof0041c7
Date: August 14, 202381435Motio008395
Date: August 24, 202381435Propo012244
Date: August 24, 2023LA440289.request
Date: September 18, 2023LA440888- Notice
Date: September 19, 202384976DEFEN00f846
Date: October 19, 202384976Propo012c59
Date: October 19, 2023Order (00806935xDE505)
Date: December 08, 2022Ponzinis CMS for 12.12.2022 CMC
Date: December 10, 202268447NOTIC00a5ee
Date: December 28, 2022Dismissal-Metasequoia (00815187xDE505)
Date: December 28, 2022NOE Dism Metasequoia-F (00816257xDE505)
Date: January 02, 20232023-01-10 ADR Stip_FILE
Date: January 10, 20232023-04-26 POS
Date: April 26, 20232023-04-26 CMS
Date: April 26, 20232023-04-26 Ntc of Jury Fees
Date: April 26, 2023NRTs TSC Statement 04-27-23
Date: April 27, 20232023-04-26 Ntc of Jury Fees
Date: April 27, 2023LA389929
Date: April 28, 2023CM (00862022xDE505)
Date: April 27, 202374894CaseM00f7dd
Date: April 28, 20232023-04-27 CMC TSC Stmt
Date: April 28, 20232023-04-28 AMENDED CMC TSC Stmt
Date: April 28, 202374940Decla012d3c
Date: April 29, 202374940Notic0273c2
Date: April 29, 202374940Appli00c452
Date: April 29, 202374940Propo03ad82
Date: April 29, 202374885CaseM0083e2
Date: April 28, 2023NRTs Amended CMC 05-01-23
Date: May 01, 202375084DEFEN001487
Date: May 02, 20232023.5.2 - Ponzini - CMS for 5.15.2023 CMC
Date: May 02, 202375351Proof01d852
Date: May 08, 202375351Trial0053cc
Date: May 08, 2023LA394996.5124499.CFCTSCStatement51523Amended
Date: May 11, 20232023-05-15 Rqst for Dismissal_Sung
Date: May 15, 2023CM (00881884xDE505)
Date: May 30, 20232023-06-01 CMS_FILE
Date: June 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Time estimate: 7 days Judge: Finigan, Jeffrey R. |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Finigan, Jeffrey R. |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | 96697Reque009cb8 | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of DISMISSAL ENTERED ON 4/18/2024 RE DAVID FRAKES & BRITTANY FRAKES Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of DISMISSAL ENTERED ON 4/18/2024 RE DAVID FRAKES & BRITTANY FRAKES |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-04-24 Ntc of Entry of Dismissal - FILE | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-04-24 POS re Ent Frakes Dismissal - FILE | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
2024-04-24 Ntc of Entry of Dismissal - FILE Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Complaint/Cross Complaint Only With Prejudice, AS TO HILLS CONSTRUCTION INC CR Request for Dismissal Complaint/Cross Complaint Only With Prejudice, AS TO HILLS CONSTRUCTION INC CROSS-COMPLAINT ONLY |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Complaint/Cross Complaint Only With Prejudice, AS TO DAVID AND BRITTANY FRAKES Request for Dismissal Complaint/Cross Complaint Only With Prejudice, AS TO DAVID AND BRITTANY FRAKES CROSS-COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.