Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Murugesan, Sirushti, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mckissick, Ross, against Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, Raiser-Ca, Llc, A Business Entity, Raiser, Llc, A Business Entity, Tanaka, Wilbur Heki, Uber Technologies, Inc., A Business Entity, (total of 5) See All represented by Braunstein, Carla N, Vahdat, Ava, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Halperin, Ernst presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHalperin, Ernst Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Complaint
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 19, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 03, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 02, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CMC - At issue - Referral to ADR | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Referral | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: CHRISTOPHER GUERRERONew Attorney: AVA VAHDAT Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: CHRISTOPHER GUERRERO New Attorney: AVA VAHDAT |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.