Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Casas, Scott, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cohn, Adrienne Z., against Actis-Grande, Allison, Does 1 To 20, Ramos, Alexis, represented by Loh, Alice K., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeiner, Marie S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 15, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Scott Casse against defendants Alexis Ramos, Allison Actis-Grande, and Does 1 to 20. The case number is 21-CIV-02192. The jurisdiction of the action is an unlimite...
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 15, 2021Complaint
Date: April 15, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 10, 202110 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: November 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 29, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 04, 2021CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.
Date: August 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 03, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: November 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
ADR Stipulation Follow Up 10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Referral | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CMC - At issue - Referral to ADR | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.