Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Lowenthal, Kamdyn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cattermole, Gregory C., against Brownstein, Natalie, Brownstein, Scott, Does 1 To 25, represented by Linn, Scott A., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The plaintiff, Kamdyn Lowenthal, is suing defendants Natalie Brownstein and Scott Brownstein. The jurisdiction of the case is in the Superior Court of California, County o...
95024Notic002576
Date: April 01, 202490590Reque001d2f
Date: January 24, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 08, 2021Complaint
Date: April 08, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: November 15, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 22, 202110 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: August 24, 202156412State005781
Date: April 19, 202210 Day Reminder Notice to Complete the ADR Process
Date: January 27, 2022CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip
Date: October 15, 2021ADR Referral
Date: July 28, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Statement
Date: June 06, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: May 13, 2022Statement of Non-Agreement
Date: April 19, 2022Demand For Jury Trial
Date: July 13, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: April 08, 202187833Notic00b6c5
Date: December 05, 202363692Reque00bc7f
Date: September 20, 202275771Notic0013f9
Date: May 15, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 21, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 13, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 21, 2022Order
Date: June 21, 202280212CaseM00a4e9
Date: August 07, 202380300CaseM00584f
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 95024Notic002576 | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial *** TIME EST. 7 DAYS *** Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 90590Reque001d2f | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | 87833Notic00b6c5 | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference For Pretrial and MSC dates Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | 80300CaseM00584f | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management and Trial Setting Statement | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | 80212CaseM00a4e9 | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Healy, Nicole S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.