Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Pham, Alex, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Smith, Evan J., against Aaker, Jennifer, Anderson, Erik, Decarbonization Plus Acquisition Corporation, Kearns, Jane, Lapeyre, Pierre, Jr, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
Category(07) Unlimited Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 08, 2021CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: July 28, 2021Complaint
Date: April 08, 2021Request For Dismissal
Date: January 10, 2022CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: November 01, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 08, 2021Dismissal - Final
Date: January 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Final | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer. | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer. | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.