Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Modern Finance Company Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Carballo Jacqueline C. Aka Yaquelin Carballo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Richard F. Walmark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 05, 2021Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Modern Finance Company Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Modern Finance Company Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
Date: November 18, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: March 05, 2021Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer
Date: April 19, 2021Writ - Request Los Angeles; Filed by:
Date: June 11, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.