Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Keshishyan Tigran, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chilyan Marine, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2022 | Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure | ||
July 22, 2022 | Request - Enter Default FL165 | ||
July 22, 2022 | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated - Rejected | ||
March 04, 2022 | Notice - Change of Address | ||
September 02, 2021 | Notice - Case Review Re: Default - Noticed by LASC | ||
December 14, 2020 | Proof of Service of Summons - Served 11/19/2020 | ||
October 30, 2020 | Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 | ||
October 30, 2020 | Declaration - Income and Expense | ||
October 30, 2020 | Declaration - UCCJEA | ||
October 30, 2020 | Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.