Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, AN OHIO CORPORATION VS AVIA INDUSTRIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.
On September 04, 2020 an other real property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge C. Virginia Keeny presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 05, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Van Nuys East
Category
Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
VERIFIED REDACTED COMPLAINT FOR:
1. JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE OF TRUST DEED
2. BREACH OF CONTRACT
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2021 | hearing |
Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401 Case Management Conference Judge: C. Virginia Keeny |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Virginia Keeny |
|
November 25, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: C. Virginia Keeny |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation as to the entire action |
|
November 25, 2020 | Request for Dismissal | ||
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Pending Action; Filed by: The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Ehud Iamburg (Defendant); Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al. |
|
November 03, 2020 | Notice - NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION | ||
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Pending Action) Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint; Filed by: The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Ehud Iamburg (Defendant); Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al. |
|
September 18, 2020 | Amended Complaint | ||
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application an Order Redacting Inadvertan...) | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Lendistry, LLC, a Michigan limited liability company (Defendant), Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant), Ehud Iamburg (Defendant), Harvest Small Business Finance, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) to Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Ehud Iamburg (Defendant), Harvest Small Business Finance, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant), Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant), Lendistry, LLC, a Michigan limited liability company (Defendant) | |
September 15, 2020 | hearing |
Ex-parte Hearing on Ex Parte Application an Order Redacting Inadvertantly Disclosed Information scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted
Judge: C. Virginia Keeny |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application an Order Redacting Inadvertantly Disclosed Information: Filed By: The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
September 15, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION AN ORDER REDACTING INADVERTAN...) | ||
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application (an Order Redacting Inadvertantly Disclosed Information) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Ex Parte Application (an Order Redacting Inadvertantly Disclosed Information) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Virginia Keeny |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application an Order Redacting Inadvertan...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 10, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing on Ex Parte Application an Order Redacting Inadvertantly Disclosed Information scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W
Judge: C. Virginia Keeny |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant), Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Harvest Small Business Finance, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant), Lendistry, LLC, a Michigan limited liability company (Defendant), Ehud Iamburg (Defendant) to Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Lendistry, LLC, a Michigan limited liability company (Defendant), Ehud Iamburg (Defendant), Harvest Small Business Finance, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant), Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application an Order Redacting Inadvertantly Disclosed Information; Filed by: The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff); As to: The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Harvest Small Business Finance, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant), Ehud Iamburg (Defendant), Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant), Lendistry, LLC, a Michigan limited liability company (Defendant) to Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant), Lendistry, LLC, a Michigan limited liability company (Defendant), Harvest Small Business Finance, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant), Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Ehud Iamburg (Defendant) | |
September 10, 2020 | Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION AN ORDER REDACTING INADVERTANTLY DISCLOSED INFORMATION | ||
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (an Order Redacting Inadvertantly Disclosed Information) Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) |
|
September 08, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W
Judge: C. Virginia Keeny |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 08, 2020 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Ehud Iamburg (Defendant); Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al. |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Ehud Iamburg (Defendant); Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al. |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Avia Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Ehud Iamburg (Defendant); Iamburg Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al. |
|
September 04, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
September 04, 2020 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, an Ohio corporation (Plaintiff) |
|