Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Wade Barbara Trustee For The Wade Family Trust A Revocable Trust, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gurwell Karin Easter, against Rooryck Jean, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management162 days |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Order for Entry of Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Motions to Quash; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Opposition #3; Filed by: Barbara Wade, Trustee for THE WADE FAMILY TRUST, a revocable trust (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order (Re: Proposed Judgment)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference (Re: Arbitration)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Order Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Status of arbitration)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Quash)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order (Re: Proposed Judgment)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Order (Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss with...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference (Re: Arbitration)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Barbara Wade, Trustee for THE WADE FAMILY TRUST, a revocable trust (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Order (Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Motions to Quash) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Order (for Entry of Judgment; Judgment) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Status of arbitration)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (#3) Filed by Barbara Wade, Trustee for THE WADE FAMILY TRUST, a revocable trust (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (Re: Proposed Judgment))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (Re: Arbitration))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Status of arbitration))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Order (on Submitted Matter re: Defendant's Motion to dismiss, Motions to quash) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Does 1 through 20, inclusive)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((not entered))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Quash, Declaration of Jean Rooryck)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss with...))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Order (Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Motions to Quash)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Order (Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference (Re: Arbitration)) of )
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Status of arbitration)))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (#3)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Order (on Submitted Matter re: Defendant's Motion to dismiss, Motions to quash)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Quash) of )
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Order (for Entry of Judgment; Judgment)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Status of arbitration)) of )
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award) of )
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Reply (- Supplemental in support of motion to dismiss without prejudice, declaration of Jean Rooryck)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (Re: Arbitration)))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order (Re: Proposed Judgment)) of )
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Quash))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: October 12, 2021Declaration (Gurwell)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO QUASH; DECLARATION OF GURWELL IN OPPOSITION)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (Re: Proposed Judgment)))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Does 1 through 20, inclusive)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((not entered))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Quash, Declaration of Jean Rooryck)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Declaration (Gurwell)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss with...))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/16/2020)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Order (on Submitted Matter re: Defendant's Motion to dismiss, Motions to quash)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Reply (- Supplemental in support of motion to dismiss without prejudice, declaration of Jean Rooryck)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO QUASH; DECLARATION OF GURWELL IN OPPOSITION)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Opposition (#3)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference (Re: Arbitration)) of 05/20/2021)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Status of arbitration)) of 02/19/2021)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (Re: Arbitration)))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award) of 09/01/2021)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order (Re: Proposed Judgment)) of 09/01/2021)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Order (Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Motions to Quash)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Re: Status of arbitration)))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Order (for Entry of Judgment; Judgment)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Quash))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (Re: Proposed Judgment)))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Order (Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Quash) of 11/17/2020)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.