Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barnato Karen Ann, Barnato Karen Ann Aka Anna Karen Barnato, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with C. Virginia Keeny presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: November 30, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver FW-003 FW/APP-016
Date: November 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 30, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 30, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: January 14, 2021Decree Changing Name
Date: January 14, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver FW-003 FW/APP-016 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 14, 2021Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by: Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner)
Date: January 14, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 14, 2021Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 14, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Filed by: Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver FW-003 FW/APP-016; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Publication; Filed by: Karen Ann Barnato (Petitioner); Service Costs Waived: No
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver FW-003 FW/APP-016
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.