Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Papesch, Arthur Ross Isam, Iii filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with SILBAR, CLAUDIA J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Child |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
MINUTE ORDER 02/11/2021
Date: February 11, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 02/10/2021 POES of 271 NTC
Date: February 10, 2021NOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 11/25/2020 Notice - Limited Scope Respresentation
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00DV ANSWER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 11/10/2020
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 02/09/2021 POES of Exhibit List
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 11/02/2020
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00DECLARATION 12/11/2020
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST - PARTY 02/09/2021 Exhibit List
Date: February 09, 2021DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 11/02/2020
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00POINTS & AUTHORITIES 02/09/2021
Date: February 09, 2021MINUTE ORDER 01/11/2021
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/10/2020
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - AMENDED 01/11/2021 1st amended
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00WITNESS LIST 02/09/2021 FL-321
Date: February 09, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 12/11/2020
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER - REASSIGNMENT - RELATED CASE 12/03/2020
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 11/02/2020
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 02/09/2021 POES of MPA FL-321
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE - OTHER 02/10/2021 271 Notice
Date: February 10, 2021DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 11/02/2020
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00DV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 12/15/2020
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.