Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pinheiro Carolina, against Lee Gregory, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Deirdre H. Hill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2020 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 21, 2020Complaint
Date: August 21, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 21, 2020Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: August 25, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 25, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: December 21, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Non Service) Filed by Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Declaration Declaration Of Non Service; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY LEE (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GREGORY LEE (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.