Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Arnold Christina, against Abdelhmeed Nasreldin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Deirdre H. Hill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeirdre H. Hill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2020 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Complaint
Date: March 10, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 10, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 12, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: March 12, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE
Date: May 21, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 02, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 23, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: June 23, 2020Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: January 04, 2021Other - - OTHER - ORDER OF DISCHARGE - CHAPTER 7
Date: April 19, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order continuing Case Management Conference and Order t...))
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Non-Service)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 23, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.