Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Okada Yoko Patsy, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Udewitz Jonathan J., against Okada George, Okada Nobuko, Okada Yoshio, represented by Schachter Robert Bailey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Ruben N. Garcia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: February 06, 2023Minute Order
Date: January 27, 2023Notice - Hearing
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 17, 2021Response - Response of Yoshio Okada to Petition to Remove Trustee etc.
Date: April 01, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 02, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 07, 2021Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: October 07, 2021Response - Response to Demurrer and Response to Motion to Strike
Date: January 13, 2022Reply - Reply
Date: January 18, 2022Objection - Trust Petition - First account current and report
Date: January 18, 2022Minute Order
Date: January 18, 2022Supplement - Supplement as to Status of Matters
Date: January 19, 2022Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing- Decedent's Estate or Trust
Date: February 03, 2022Notice - Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 09, 2022Supplement - 1st Supplement Removal Petition
Date: April 07, 2022Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing- Decedent's Estate or Trust
Date: March 24, 2022Supplement - 1st Supplement Suspension Petition
Date: April 07, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 12, 2022Objection - Trust Petition - Objection to Amended First Account
Date: May 27, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 01, 2022Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: December 22, 2022Notice - Notice of Scheduling of Private Mediation, 2/6/23
Date: February 03, 2023Minute Order
Date: February 06, 2023Notice - Notice of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: February 27, 2023Notice - Hearing
Date: May 01, 2023Minute Order
Date: June 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Trust 17200 Hearing |
|
February 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Probate Code 850 Hearing |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Garcia, Ruben, Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Garcia Ruben |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 9, Garcia, Ruben, Presiding Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held - Continued Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Garcia Ruben |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Respondent |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Supplement (1st Supplement to Petition for Return, Etc., Filed ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection - Trust Petition (Response to Petition for Return of Real and Personal Property Assets to the Trust or Estate and Other Claims ) Filed by Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.