Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tsukano James, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by De La Vega Amanda Esq, De La Vega Amanda Mary, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael W. Fitzgerald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael W. Fitzgerald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a supplemental petition for letters of administration in the estate of Harry Yoshinobu Tsukano. The petitioner, James Tsukano, is represented by attorney Amanda de la Vega. The petition includes two probate notes. Probate Note A sta...
Minute Order
Date: December 21, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 26, 2022Order - Appointing Personal Representative
Date: April 07, 2021Order - Appointing Personal Representative
Date: May 19, 2021Minute Order
Date: March 11, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 18, 2022Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)
Date: November 03, 2020Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative
Date: November 03, 2020Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003
Date: November 04, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 04, 2020PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection
Date: December 28, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: January 08, 2021Waiver - (No Fee)
Date: February 25, 2021Supplement - Supplement to Petition To Administer the Estate
Date: March 04, 2021Notice - Petition to Administer Estate
Date: March 04, 2021Letters (Initial)
Date: June 11, 2021Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative
Date: June 11, 2021Status Report of Personal Representative
Date: March 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Status Report Hearing |
|
March 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Uzcategui, Jessica A., Presiding Status Report Hearing - Held - Continued Status Report Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Uzcategui Jessica A. |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (The Status Report of Personal Representative filed on by Petitioner(s) James Tsukano ) | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Uzcategui, Jessica A., Presiding Status Report Hearing - Held Status Report Hearing - Held Judge: Uzcategui Jessica A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.