Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Booker Melody, Tucker Kimberley, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Regus Mark William Ii, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Lynn H. Scaduto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2020 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: April 14, 2023Minute Order
Date: October 19, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 02, 2021Notice - Hearing
Date: March 15, 2021Request - Continuance (Granted)
Date: April 23, 2021Notice - Hearing
Date: June 16, 2021Request - Continuance (Granted) - to 2/3/2022
Date: October 25, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 03, 2022Notice - Hearing
Date: April 01, 2022Supplement - Supplement
Date: April 04, 2022Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: April 08, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 03, 2022Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: May 06, 2022Minute Order
Date: June 14, 2022Notice - Hearing - 4/14/23
Date: March 28, 2023Minute Order
Date: April 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order (ORDER SETTLING ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF TRUSTEE MELODY BOOKER ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bond (Liberty Mutual Insurance Company ) Filed by Other |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Accounting ( Setting Account and Report of Trustee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Trust (Order Appointing Successor Trustee ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 79, Scaduto, Lynn H., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Scaduto Lynn H. |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Trust |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.