Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tisch Patricia K., Tisch Steven E., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Calaba Frank Victor, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Deborah L. Christian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order
Date: April 07, 2023Minute Order
Date: March 24, 2023Order
Date: October 18, 2022Ex Parte - Order
Date: March 25, 2021Letters (Initial)
Date: March 29, 2021Disclaimer - Disclaimer of Interest
Date: April 28, 2021Notice - Proposed Action - Notice of Proposed Action
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2022Notice - Hearing
Date: August 03, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 07, 2022Account - Final or Waiver - Waiver of First and Final Account, etc.
Date: January 12, 2023Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: January 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Accounting (Order Settling Waiver of First and Final Account and Report; etc. ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 24, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Accounting Hearing |
|
March 24, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 13, 2023 | Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.