Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dcm Services, Ko David Kwangduk, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jonathan L. Rosenbloom presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative
Date: September 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DISP: Denied-Initial Petition-Before Crt Hrg/Trial | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Denied | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
July 02, 2021 | Hearing | ||
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Court Order Hearing - Held Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Creditor |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.