Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Medina Fernando Jose Torres, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Meinecke Peter M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Brenda Penny presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Matcham, Susan J., Presiding Guardianship Review Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Matcham Susan J. |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Nominee |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Penny Brenda J. |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding Court Order Hearing - Held Judge: Luna Ana Maria |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letters (Initial) Filed by Nominee |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notification - Cons/Guard Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.