Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
THE MARTHA P. NIELSEN REVOCABLE TRUST
On September 10, 2020 a trust (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Biava James E., represented by Schachter Robert Bailey, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Daniel Juarez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 10, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 20, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Trust (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Trusts
Status
Other
Overview
Causes of Action
SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR
COURT ORDER APPROVING
RESIGNATION OF NAMED
SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND
APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR
TRUSTEE
Hearing Date: 01/28/2021
Time: 8:30 a.m.
Department: 67
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Order (Order on Petition ) | |
April 28, 2021 | Order - Order on Petition | ||
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (Proof of Bond ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 25, 2021 | Miscellaneous Document - Proof of Bond | ||
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document (Proof of Bond ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bond (Liberty Mutual Insurance Company ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 23, 2021 | Bond - Liberty Mutual Insurance Company | ||
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bond (Liberty Mutual Insurance Company ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Rejected Proposed Order | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Trust |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
LACourtConnect-Fees Paid Filed by Trust Filed by Trust |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Juarez Daniel |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
January 28, 2021 | Minute Order | ||
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Juarez Daniel |
|
January 28, 2021 | hearing |
Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Trust 17200 Hearing |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplement (To Petition for Court Order ) Filed by Attorney |
|
January 27, 2021 | Supplement - To Petition for Court Order | ||
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplement (To Petition for Court Order ) Filed by Attorney Filed by Attorney |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplement (Second Supplement ) Filed by Attorney |
|
January 26, 2021 | Supplement - Second Supplement | ||
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplement (Second Supplement ) Filed by Attorney Filed by Attorney |
|
January 26, 2021 | hearing |
Supplement (Second Supplement ) Filed by Attorney |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent (Consent and Approval to Petition etc. ) Filed by Attorney |
|
January 22, 2021 | Consent - Consent and Approval to Petition etc. | ||
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent (Consent and Approval to Petition etc. ) Filed by Attorney Filed by Attorney |
|
January 22, 2021 | hearing |
Consent (Consent and Approval to Petition etc. ) Filed by Attorney |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Trust |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Trust Filed by Trust |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Attorney |
|
January 07, 2021 | Notice - Hearing | ||
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Attorney Filed by Attorney |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2021 | Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing | ||
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2021 | hearing |
Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Attorney |
|
December 23, 2020 | Notice - Hearing | ||
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Attorney Filed by Attorney |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Court Order Approving Resignation etc. ) Filed by Attorney |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) | |
September 10, 2020 | Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Court Order Approving Resignation etc. | ||
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Court Order Approving Resignation etc. ) Filed by Attorney PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Attorney |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) | |
September 10, 2020 | hearing |
Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Court Order Approving Resignation etc. ) Filed by Attorney |