Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Legler Jeffrey, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Masteller Kira Sue, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Deborah L. Christian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: October 24, 2022Minute Order
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 23, 2023Minute Order
Date: October 26, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 11, 2022Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)
Date: July 16, 2020Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling - December 11, 2020
Date: December 11, 2020Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Declaratory Relief
Date: December 22, 2020Proof of Service - Proof of Service
Date: December 23, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 09, 2021Order
Date: April 23, 2021Bond - Liberty Mutual Ins. Co
Date: April 27, 2021Proof of Service - Proof of Service
Date: April 30, 2021Proof of Service - Proof of Service
Date: May 03, 2021Supplement
Date: July 28, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2021Citation
Date: August 04, 2021Proof of Service - not found/ no service/ cancelled
Date: September 21, 2021Notice - Hearing
Date: August 16, 2021Supplement
Date: October 22, 2021Notice - Hearing
Date: October 27, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 01, 2021Notice - Hearing
Date: December 01, 2021Citation
Date: December 02, 2021Notice - of Service
Date: February 04, 2022Proof of Service
Date: February 04, 2022Proof of Service
Date: February 07, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 15, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 18, 2022Notice - Hearing - OSC - 5/6/22
Date: March 23, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAMELA BLATTNER,TRUSTEE (Declarations)
Date: July 01, 2022Notice - Ruling
Date: July 13, 2022Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)
Date: August 01, 2022Inventory & Appraisal - Final
Date: September 20, 2022Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)
Date: October 19, 2022Proof of Service
Date: October 20, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAMELA BLATTNER,TRUSTEE (Declarations)
Date: October 20, 2022Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)
Date: November 07, 2022Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling (Notices)
Date: November 07, 2022Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003
Date: March 23, 2023Notice - Hearing
Date: April 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Citee |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Trust |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (10/23 OSC ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Citee |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Trust |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.