Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ascension Point Recovery Services, Ascensionpoint Recovery Services Llc, Tello Maria Avalos, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Apodaca Elizabeth Theresa, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Paul T. Suzuki presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul T. Suzuki Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: April 06, 2022Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)
Date: July 13, 2020Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities
Date: July 13, 2020Notice - Petition to Administer Estate
Date: July 27, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: July 31, 2020Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - Alicia Zepeda
Date: November 24, 2020Notice - Petition to Administer Estate
Date: December 23, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 01, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 03, 2021Creditor's Claim
Date: February 17, 2021Bond
Date: February 19, 2021Order - Appointing Personal Representative
Date: February 24, 2021Letters (Initial)
Date: March 09, 2021Creditor's Claim
Date: April 21, 2021Creditor's Claim
Date: April 22, 2021Notice - Notice to DHCS
Date: May 03, 2021Inventory & Appraisal - Final $1,105,000.00
Date: May 03, 2021Notice - Proposed Action - Notice of Proposed Action
Date: June 02, 2021Notice - Notice to FTB
Date: May 03, 2021Request - Special Notice (No Fee)
Date: June 23, 2021Notice - Proposed Action - Notice of Proposed Action
Date: June 30, 2021Withdrawal - Special Notice
Date: September 14, 2021Notice - Proposed Action - Notice of Proposed Action
Date: November 16, 2021Account - Final or Waiver - Account - Final or Waiver
Date: January 25, 2022Notice - Hearing - First and Final Account - 04/06/22
Date: March 23, 2022Declaration - Application For Showing Good Cause
Date: April 01, 2022Supplement - Supplement to First & Final Account
Date: April 01, 2022Declaration - Spousal Property Election
Date: April 01, 2022Declaration - Spousal Property Election
Date: April 06, 2022Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing for 6/30/22
Date: May 18, 2022Proof of Service - Proof of Service to Third Supplement filed 6/14/22
Date: June 21, 2022Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel (Reports)
Date: June 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 79, Scaduto, Lynn H., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Scaduto Lynn H. |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt (Receipt for Administrative Commission ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt (Receipt of Distributee - Maria ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 79, Scaduto, Lynn H., Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Scaduto Lynn H. |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Mail - Returned Mail (Citation w/pos ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.