Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Roberson Robin K., filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Hindenlang Walter James, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael W. Fitzgerald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael W. Fitzgerald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2020 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time151 days |
Notice - Hearing
Date: April 29, 2020Supplement - Supplement to Petition
Date: September 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 15, 2020Order
Date: September 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 21, 2020 | Order | ||
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) filed on April 17, 2020 by Robin K. Roberson. ) | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Small Michael |
|
September 15, 2020 | Minute Order | ||
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) filed on April 17, 2020 by Robin K. Roberson. ) | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Supplement (Supplement to Petition ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 03, 2020 | Supplement - Supplement to Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.