Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hernandez Laura Flores, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Firouzi Neda, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Brenda Penny presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2020 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 29, 2021Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code)
Date: April 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 18, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 10, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 07, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 02, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 23, 2021Notice - Hearing
Date: November 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Rejected Proposed Order | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Rejected Proposed Order | |
March 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Trust 17200 Hearing |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) filed on April 3, 2020 by Laura Flores Hernandez. ) | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) filed on April 3, 2020 by Laura Flores Hernandez. ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.