Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Avitia Agustin, Herrera Lorena, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Gaudy Jason Louis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael W. Fitzgerald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael W. Fitzgerald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: January 12, 2022Order - Final Distribution
Date: February 17, 2022Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative
Date: March 12, 2020Petition - Probate of Lost Will (Initial)
Date: March 12, 2020Notice - Petition to Administer Estate
Date: March 19, 2020Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: March 26, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 03, 2020Notice - Petition to Administer Estate
Date: June 10, 2020Request - Special Notice
Date: July 06, 2020Supplement - Supplement
Date: July 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 15, 2020Letters (Initial)
Date: August 04, 2020Order - Appointing Personal Representative
Date: July 31, 2020Notice - Notice to Department of Health Care Services
Date: September 10, 2020Notice - Notice to Franchise Tax Board
Date: September 10, 2020Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal
Date: May 11, 2021Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action
Date: June 01, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 25, 2021Account - Final or Waiver - First and Final Acct
Date: August 25, 2021Notice - Hearing
Date: August 26, 2021Supplement
Date: January 06, 2022Receipt - Receipt
Date: February 17, 2022Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Date: February 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order - Final Distribution | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt (Receipt ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 17, 2022 | Receipt - Receipt | ||
February 17, 2022 | Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order | ||
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (The Account - Final or Waiver filed on by Petitioner(s) Agustin Avitia, Lorena Herrera ) | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Small Michael |
|
January 12, 2022 | Hearing |
Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Accounting Hearing |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Supplement Filed by Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.