Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Xx Xxxx Xxxxxxx, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Grebe Sibylle, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elizabeth A. Grimes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2020 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Probate Investigator General/Limited Cons'r Review Report | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Mail - Certificate of Mailing | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (Motion - Seal filed on June 2, 2022 by xxxxxxx xx xxxx. ) | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding Motion Hearing - Held - Motion Denied Motion Hearing - Held - Motion Denied Judge: Bogdanoff Lee R. |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Seal Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 02, 2022 | Declaration | ||
June 02, 2022 | Notice - Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.