Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lisa Davidson, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Jiffy Lube International Inc., represented by Chammas Jack, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Katherine Chilton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: Jiffy Lube International, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: February 02, 2021Complaint; Filed by: Davidson Lisa (Plaintiff); As to: Jiffy Lube International, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 17, 2021Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jiffy Lube International, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Opposition to motion for sanctions; Filed by: Davidson Lisa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 24, 2020First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: November 24, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: November 24, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: November 24, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: November 24, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: February 02, 2021Motion for Sanctions - Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 26, 2021Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 26, 2021Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to motion for sanctions
Date: August 04, 2021Reply (name extension) - Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Sanctions
Date: August 10, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)
Date: August 17, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: January 06, 2022Answer; Filed by: Jiffy Lube International, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Opposition to motion for sanctions; Filed by: Davidson Lisa (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Davidson Lisa (Plaintiff); As to: Jiffy Lube International, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jiffy Lube International, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.