Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mahfouz Richard L., against Azizian Edward Albert, Stepanyan Izabella, represented by Kim Leah J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Katherine Chilton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 30, 2022Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: EDWARD ALBERT AZIZIAN (Defendant); IZABELLA STEPANYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Richard L. Mahfouz (Attorney)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 04, 2020First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: September 04, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: September 04, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: September 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 04, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 18, 2020Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial
Date: October 09, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: November 16, 2020Order (name extension) - Order Proposed Order
Date: February 10, 2022Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stip to Continue Trial
Date: February 10, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Continuance of Jury Trial)
Date: August 19, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)
Date: November 07, 2022Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: November 07, 2022Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: November 30, 2022Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Settlement
Date: December 12, 2022Order (name extension) - Order Proposed Order
Date: December 28, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.