Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA, ET AL.
On September 04, 2020 an insurance coverage (not complex) (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 20, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Serena R. Murillo;Category
Insurance Coverage (not complex) (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION
RECOVERY
[Limited jurisdiction – demand more than
$10,000.00 and less than $25,000.00]
AMOUNT OF DAMAGES: $19,638.64
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | hearing |
Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service |
|
November 22, 2022 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY as to the entire action |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | The case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant); VANESSA JIMENEZ (Defendant) |
|
November 22, 2022 | Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal | ||
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant); VANESSA JIMENEZ (Defendant) |
|
October 18, 2022 | Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing | ||
October 04, 2022 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
October 04, 2022 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: removed | |
October 04, 2022 | Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) | ||
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement | |
September 30, 2022 | Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement | ||
March 04, 2022 | hearing |
Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial Judge: Mark E. Windham |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Stipulation to Continue Trial; Signed and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant) |
|
March 01, 2022 | hearing | Pursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
March 01, 2022 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
March 01, 2022 | Order (name extension) - Order on Stipulation to Continue Trial | ||
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant) |
|
February 28, 2022 | Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial | ||
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant); VANESSA JIMENEZ (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff) |
|
October 14, 2020 | Answer - Answer | ||
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: VANESSA JIMENEZ (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No |
|
September 18, 2020 | Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service | ||
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
September 04, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant); VANESSA JIMENEZ (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant); VANESSA JIMENEZ (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant); VANESSA JIMENEZ (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Serena R\. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse | |
September 04, 2020 | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case | ||
September 04, 2020 | Complaint - Complaint | ||
September 04, 2020 | Summons - Summons on Complaint | ||
September 04, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
September 04, 2020 | First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order | ||
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant); VANESSA JIMENEZ (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant); VANESSA JIMENEZ (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/08/2023 in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2022 in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: EMILIO IBARRA DAVILA (Defendant); VANESSA JIMENEZ (Defendant) |
|