Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ET AL.
On September 04, 2020 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2020
Last Refreshed
September 05, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Serena R. Murillo;Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT OF SIXT RENT A
CAR LLC FOR:
(1
(2
IMPLIED INDEMNITY;
EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT
OF FAULT; and
(3) CONTRIBUTION
JUDGE: Serena R. Murillo
DEPT.: 26
ACTION FILED: September 4, 2020
TRIAL DATE: March 4, 2022
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | hearing |
Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service |
|
March 04, 2022 | hearing |
Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial Judge: Mark E. Windham |
|
May 03, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Address for Manuel M Magpapian (Attorney) null | |
May 03, 2021 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY as to the entire action |
|
April 28, 2021 | Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal | ||
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
October 26, 2020 | Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service | ||
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- John T. Griffin (Attorney): First Name changed from John to John T. Middle Name: blank | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff) |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff) |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint; Filed by: SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff) |
|
October 20, 2020 | Summons - Summons on Complaint | ||
October 20, 2020 | Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint | ||
October 20, 2020 | Answer - Answer | ||
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Serena R\. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); KELI LI (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); KELI LI (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 04, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); KELI LI (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
September 04, 2020 | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case | ||
September 04, 2020 | First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order | ||
September 04, 2020 | Complaint - Complaint | ||
September 04, 2020 | Summons - Summons on Complaint | ||
September 04, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); KELI LI (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); KELI LI (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2022 in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/08/2023 in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SIXT RENT A CAR, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant); KELI LI (Defendant) |
|