Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rahman Jamilur, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Walch Robert, against Champion Cjd, Ean Holdings Llc, Wang David Wen Chen, represented by Santiago Christen Denise, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: August 26, 2020Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: August 26, 2020Complaint - Complaint
Date: August 26, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 26, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 30, 2020Answer - Answer
Date: November 09, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 09, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: December 30, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 16, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jamilur Rahman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: David Wen Chen Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: David Wen Chen Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: David Wen Chen Wang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.