Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dan Contractor A Sole Proprietorship, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Plumtree A. Maria, against Saavedra Maria, represented by Cronin Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Declaration Defendant Maria Saavedra; Filed by: Maria Saavedra (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Maria Saavedra (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Maria Saavedra (Defendant); As to: Dan Contractor, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Maria Saavedra (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Maria Saavedra (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Maria Saavedra (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Dan Contractor, a sole proprietorship (Plaintiff)
Date: February 23, 2022Separate Statement; Filed by: Maria Saavedra (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Declaration KEC in support of MSJ; Filed by: Maria Saavedra (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 21, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 29, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Defendant Maria Saavedra
Date: September 29, 2021Separate Statement - Separate Statement
Date: September 29, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration KEC in support of MSJ
Date: September 29, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 03, 2021Exhibit List - Exhibit List
Date: October 05, 2021Motion to Amend Judgment - Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: October 05, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: December 10, 2021Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: December 16, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens
Date: February 23, 2022Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: February 23, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.