Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Parking Violations Bureau, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Lee S. Arian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2020 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Parking Appeal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 06, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Karin Seibold (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 06, 2020Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking
Date: July 14, 2020Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: August 05, 2020Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: August 19, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 21, 2020Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal
Date: November 06, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)
Date: November 06, 2020Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Karin Seibold (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.